General Info | |||||||||||
| |
Team | Stats | ||||||||||||||
|
|
Trophy Room |
Achievements |
Was manager of AO Latsia from 31/01/2015 to 24/03/2015. |
Was manager of Rapid Satu Mare from 16/09/2014 to 31/01/2015. |
Was manager of Universitatea Slatina from 16/08/2014 to 16/09/2014. |
Was manager of Powys Welfare from 14/01/2014 to 18/02/2014. |
Was manager of Universitatea Slobozia from 24/12/2013 to 14/01/2014. |
Was manager of FC Puerto Ordaz from 22/03/2012 to 03/07/2012. |
Was manager of Universitatea Slobozia from 14/12/2011 to 22/03/2012. |
Was manager of Kirkcaldy Town from 29/07/2011 to 14/12/2011. |
Was manager of FC Hasselt from 27/04/2011 to 29/07/2011. |
Was manager of Gudja AFC from 18/01/2011 to 27/04/2011. |
Was manager of Igea Udine from 08/10/2010 to 18/01/2011. |
Was manager of Puno Municipal from 16/07/2010 to 08/10/2010. |
Was manager of Poli Pt. Neamt from 18/01/2010 to 16/07/2010. |
Season | Team | Division | Standings | W | D | L | Points | Nat Rank | Int Rank |
79 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
78 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
77 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
76 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
75 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
74 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
73 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
72 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
71 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
70 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
69 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
68 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
67 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
66 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
65 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
64 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
63 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
62 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
61 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
60 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
59 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
58 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
57 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
56 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
55 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
54 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
Nick | |
Country | Under-21 |